TN SB1352 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 477
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 477
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions governing permits for movements of certain overweight and overdimensional vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50; Section 55-7-203 and Section 55-7-205.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions governing permits for movements of certain overweight and overdimensional vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50; Section 55-7-203 and Section 55-7-205.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 477 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0812 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 477