TN SB1339 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a licensed aesthetician to perform cosmetic microneedling if performed under the supervision of a licensed physician. - Amends TCA Section 62-4-109.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 62-4-109, relative to the practice of aesthetics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 376 | |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0291) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0291) |
2021-04-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0915 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 376