TN SB1339 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 252
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 252
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases from five to 10 years the minimum age of an abandoned vehicle that can be destroyed without title and notification of last owner of record and lienholders. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As enacted, increases from five to 10 years the minimum age of an abandoned vehicle that can be destroyed without title and notification of last owner of record and lienholders. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 252 | |
2009-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/20/09 | |
2009-05-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-05-13 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-05-12 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-05-11 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-05-08 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-05-07 | Passed H., Ayes 72, Nays 16, PNV 1 | |
2009-05-07 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-05-07 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-05-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-05-04 | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 05/04/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/14/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1631 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 252