TN SB1319 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that calling or emailing a person, instead of knocking at the person's door, would constitute reasonable, good faith effort to notify the person prior to utility being disconnected under the Utilities' Cut-Off Procedures Act, which only applies in Davidson County. - Amends TCA Title 65, Chapter 32.
Title
As enacted, specifies that calling or emailing a person, instead of knocking at the person's door, would constitute reasonable, good faith effort to notify the person prior to utility being disconnected under the Utilities' Cut-Off Procedures Act, which only applies in Davidson County. - Amends TCA Title 65, Chapter 32.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Pub. Ch. 373 |
2013-05-22 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2013 |
2013-05-14 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-23 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | S. Reset on cal. for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. F,W&M Comm. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1207 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 373