TN SB1311 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a Class D felony offense for any unlicensed person to sell, distribute, or possess with the intent to sell or distribute a controlled substance when that controlled substance is obtained with the use of TennCare benefits which were used as payment for an office visit, obtaining a prescription, or for any other health management program. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 53 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, creates a Class D felony offense for any unlicensed person to sell, distribute, or possess with the intent to sell or distribute a controlled substance when that controlled substance is obtained with the use of TennCare benefits which were used as payment for an office visit, obtaining a prescription, or for any other health management program. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 53 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm |
2013-02-25 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1311&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1311.pdf |