TN SB1310 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the peace officer standards and training commission to include training on topics such as cultural competency in its annual in-service training in order for officers to meet the required certification requirements. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, requires the peace officer standards and training commission to include training on topics such as cultural competency in its annual in-service training in order for officers to meet the required certification requirements. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0856 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-17 - Meeting Canceled