TN SB1308 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Constitutional Enforcement Restraint Act of 2013." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 38.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Constitutional Enforcement Restraint Act of 2013." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 38.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Recalled from S. Jud. Comm. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1239 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1308&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1308.pdf |