TN SB1302 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes requirement that certain funds from the 1986 gasoline tax increases be used only for specific highway projects during the 1986-1987 and 1993-1994 fiscal years. - Amends TCA Title 54; Title 55; Title 64; Title 65 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, deletes requirement that certain funds from the 1986 gasoline tax increases be used only for specific highway projects during the 1986-1987 and 1993-1994 fiscal years. - Amends TCA Title 54; Title 55; Title 64; Title 65 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/22/19 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0262 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee