TN SB1294 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of audit, as part of its performance review of state entities under the governmental entity review law, to conduct a comprehensive analysis of the extent to which the entity is in compliance with Title VI of the Civil Rights Act. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of audit, as part of its performance review of state entities under the governmental entity review law, to conduct a comprehensive analysis of the extent to which the entity is in compliance with Title VI of the Civil Rights Act. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1482 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar