TN SB1285 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that where a proposed charter of metropolitan government is ratified by a majority of those voting in a principal city and in the county outside of the principal city, but a smaller city continues, the smaller city shall retain all powers of a separate city that are authorized under the constitution, its charter and the general laws of this state. - Amends TCA Title 7.
Title
As introduced, provides that where a proposed charter of metropolitan government is ratified by a majority of those voting in a principal city and in the county outside of the principal city, but a smaller city continues, the smaller city shall retain all powers of a separate city that are authorized under the constitution, its charter and the general laws of this state. - Amends TCA Title 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/9/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to final cal. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1204 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1285&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1285.pdf |