TN SB1276 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that any municipal electric system that provides cable or Internet services shall be subject to regulation by the Tennessee regulatory authority. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 52, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, provides that any municipal electric system that provides cable or Internet services shall be subject to regulation by the Tennessee regulatory authority. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 52, Part 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 5/5/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-25 | Recalled from S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1957 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1276&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1276.pdf |