TN SB1264 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes provisions governing the practice of certified medical assistants. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to certified medical assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 396 | |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0559 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021