TN SB1243 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the procedures for selling the state-owned property where the Lakeshore Mental Health Institute was operated prior to its closure. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 12, Chapter 2 and Title 33.
Title
As introduced, revises the procedures for selling the state-owned property where the Lakeshore Mental Health Institute was operated prior to its closure. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 12, Chapter 2 and Title 33.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Recalled from S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1281 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-26 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1243&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1243.pdf |