TN SB1237 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a court to apportion fault to an employer who covered an employee under workers' compensation when such employee brings an action against a third-party tortfeasor and reduces the employer's subrogation recovery to the extent such employer has allocated fault. - Amends TCA Title 50; Title 56 and Title 62.
Title
As introduced, allows a court to apportion fault to an employer who covered an employee under workers' compensation when such employee brings an action against a third-party tortfeasor and reduces the employer's subrogation recovery to the extent such employer has allocated fault. - Amends TCA Title 50; Title 56 and Title 62.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0451 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-12 - Taken off notice for cal. in Consumer and Human Resources Committee