TN SB1235 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 288
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 288
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various revisions to regulations governing cemetery companies or other entities engaged in the business of selling, leasing, or renting lots, grave spaces, crypts, niches, and burial rights for the interment of deceased persons; requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to issue audit reports after auditing a cemetery company. - Amends TCA Title 46, Chapter 1 and Title 62.
Title
As enacted, makes various revisions to regulations governing cemetery companies or other entities engaged in the business of selling, leasing, or renting lots, grave spaces, crypts, niches, and burial rights for the interment of deceased persons; requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to issue audit reports after auditing a cemetery company. - Amends TCA Title 46, Chapter 1 and Title 62.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 288 | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means until 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1307 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 288