TN SB1221 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Improving Manufacturing, Public Roads and Opportunities for a Vibrant Economy (IMPROVE) Act" or the "2017 Tax Cut Act." - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 1; Title 55, Chapter 6; Title 67, Chapter 2; Title 67, Chapter 3; Title 67, Chapter 4; Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Improving Manufacturing, Public Roads and Opportunities for a Vibrant Economy (IMPROVE) Act" or the "2017 Tax Cut Act." - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 1; Title 55, Chapter 6; Title 67, Chapter 2; Title 67, Chapter 3; Title 67, Chapter 4; Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Jim Tracy [R] | Sen. Thelma Harper [D] | Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 181 | |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0534 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 181