TN SB1202 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions relating to the licensing of certain non-depository financial institutions. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 13; Title 45, Chapter 15; Title 45, Chapter 18; Title 45, Chapter 5 and Title 56, Chapter 37.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions relating to the licensing of certain non-depository financial institutions. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 13; Title 45, Chapter 15; Title 45, Chapter 18; Title 45, Chapter 5 and Title 56, Chapter 37.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Pub. Ch. 122 | |
2017-04-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017; 04/01/2018;04/07/01/2018; 04/01/2019 | |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-20 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0086) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/16/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0314 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 122