TN SB1168 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the bureau of workers' compensation, on or before January 1, 2023, and annually thereafter, to review the impact of the Workers' Compensation Reform Act of 2013 on the workers' compensation system in this state and deliver a report of its findings to each member of the general assembly and provide a presentation of its findings to the commerce committee of the house of representatives and the commerce and labor committee of the senate. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56, relative to workers' compensation.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1311 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.