TN SB1161 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, adds to provisions governing students with a parent in the armed forces being given excused absences to additionally provide for up to 10 days cumulatively within the school year for visitation during the member's deployment cycle; cumulative number of excused absences under this provision and present provision for visitation with parent when the member is granted rest and recuperation leave and is stationed out of the country may not exceed 10 days. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, adds to provisions governing students with a parent in the armed forces being given excused absences to additionally provide for up to 10 days cumulatively within the school year for visitation during the member's deployment cycle; cumulative number of excused absences under this provision and present provision for visitation with parent when the member is granted rest and recuperation leave and is stationed out of the country may not exceed 10 days. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24HousePub. Ch. 155
2013-04-24HouseEffective date(s) 07/01/2013
2013-04-16HouseSigned by Governor.
2013-04-04HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-04-04HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2013-04-04HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2013-04-03HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-04-03HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0
2013-04-03HouseAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0174)
2013-04-03SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2013-04-03SenateSubst. for comp. HB.
2013-04-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-04-01SenatePassed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0
2013-04-01SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0197)
2013-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/1/2013
2013-03-20SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2013-03-14SenatePlaced on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013
2013-02-07SenateP2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
2013-02-06SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-02-05SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0746 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 155

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback