TN SB1159 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes requirement that a child must suffer physical injury for a parent or custodian to commit the offense of child endangerment and raises age of child who may be victim of offense of child endangerment from eight to 10 years of age. - Amends TCA Section 39-15-401.
Title
As introduced, removes requirement that a child must suffer physical injury for a parent or custodian to commit the offense of child endangerment and raises age of child who may be victim of offense of child endangerment from eight to 10 years of age. - Amends TCA Section 39-15-401.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0540 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee