TN SB1128 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 938
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 938
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions regarding real and personal property taxes, including provisions governing property tax freeze, reviews of parcels and electronic filing. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions regarding real and personal property taxes, including provisions governing property tax freeze, reviews of parcels and electronic filing. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 938 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 05/19/2014 |
2014-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-24 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-16 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 2 |
2014-04-16 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1211) |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. no. 2 reconsidered. |
2014-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider actions adopted. |
2014-04-15 | House | Motion to lift from table the motion to reconsider actions adopted. |
2014-04-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1211) |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1094) |
2014-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0910) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1116 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 938