TN SB1112 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a sentence of death to be carried out within 30 business days of the conclusion of any appeals or post-conviction relief, if the jury unanimously determines that certain circumstances are met. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to imposition of the death penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 375 | |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0289 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023