TN SB1100 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Pub. Ch. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Pub. Ch. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes property tax relief to surviving spouses of disabled veterans who would have been eligible for relief had the veteran qualified under later amendments to the law. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-704.
Title
As enacted, authorizes property tax relief to surviving spouses of disabled veterans who would have been eligible for relief had the veteran qualified under later amendments to the law. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-704.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Pub. Ch. 418 | |
2011-06-10 | Effective date(s) 06/06/11 | |
2011-06-06 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-31 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-25 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-21 | Passed H., Ayes 83, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-21 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-05-21 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-05-21 | Passed S., Ayes 28, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/21/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-03-08 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2011-03-03 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/8/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/8/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/1/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1886 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 418