TN SB1098 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the sales tax on diapers and wipes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3, relative to the sales and use tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1572 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee