TN SB1079 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes an obsolete cross-reference to a statute that was repealed in 2010. - Amends TCA Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, relative to state facilities for the care of children.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-15SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2023-03-15SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/22/2023
2023-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/15/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1297 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-15 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback