TN SB1074 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an international studies component in curriculum so that in order to graduate from a college or university after July 1, 2011, a student would have to complete eight such courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires an international studies component in curriculum so that in order to graduate from a college or university after July 1, 2011, a student would have to complete eight such courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/31/2010 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0934 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-31 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1074&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1074.pdf |