TN SB1072 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes certain changes to the practice of occupational therapy, including authorizing the practice of dry needling of the upper limb, authorizing the making of certain treatment diagnoses, and authorizing practice via telehealth; authorizes the practice of physical therapy via telehealth. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63, Chapter 13, relative to medical occupations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-04-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-04-05HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-03-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-03-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-03-22HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-03-22HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-03-18HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-03-15SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-15SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2021-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021
2021-03-10SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/10/2021
2021-03-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/10/2021
2021-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/3/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1275 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-22 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback