TN SB1066 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the time in which a handgun carry permit holder is required to inform the department of safety of any change in the permit holder's principal place of residence from 60 days to 90 days. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 49, relative to firearms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-07SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1204 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback