TN SB1058 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes municipal electrics to provide cable service, two-way video transmission, video programming, and internet services outside its service area. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 52.
Title
As introduced, authorizes municipal electrics to provide cable service, two-way video transmission, video programming, and internet services outside its service area. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 52.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reset on Final Calendar of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0970 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee