TN SB1048 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, sets new caseload requirements for case managers in the department to take effect January 1, 2025; requires the department to employ special response team personnel, who do not maintain regular caseloads but are available to assume cases from case managers to assist in maintaining caseload standards, respond to emergent situations, and guard against interruption in service delivery; requires the department to notify the governor, the members of the general assembly, and the Tennessee commission on children and youth if staffing requirements are not met. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, relative to the department of children's services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] |
Sen. London Lamar [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 6 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0604) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2023 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1032 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee