TN SB1044 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that it is the attorney general and reporter and not the district attorney general who is compensated from the proceeds for expenses in bringing the action to forfeit items used in the offense of identity theft. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that it is the attorney general and reporter and not the district attorney general who is compensated from the proceeds for expenses in bringing the action to forfeit items used in the offense of identity theft. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Com. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1068 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1044&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1044.pdf |