TN SB1001 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 60 to 90 days, the maximum timeframe in which the governing board of the regional transportation authority of Middle Tennessee may vote to adopt alternative provisions to operate as a regional transportation authority. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 7; Title 54; Title 55; Title 64 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, increases from 60 to 90 days, the maximum timeframe in which the governing board of the regional transportation authority of Middle Tennessee may vote to adopt alternative provisions to operate as a regional transportation authority. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 7; Title 54; Title 55; Title 64 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1344 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.