TN SB0977 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires certain information to be provided to the assessor of property; authorizes a county or municipal governing body to adopt by 2/3 vote a provision to allow proration of property taxes for tangible personal property that is destroyed, demolished, or substantially damaged as a result of a disaster. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 2 and Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 58, Chapter 2 and Title 67, Chapter 5, relative to property assessment.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1032 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee