TN SB0969 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Neutrality and Internet Consumer Protection Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 12; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Neutrality and Internet Consumer Protection Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 12; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1060 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-13 - Failed in s/c Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee