TN SB0965 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires a judge to notify, if practicable, a defendant at the time of sentencing if the conviction is for an expungeable offense and the time period after which a petition to expunge may be filed; requires the administrative office of the courts to provide judges handling criminal matters with reference document containing certain information. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32 and Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 32 and Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 3, relative to expunction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 78 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Pub. Ch. 358
2021-05-18 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-05-11SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-05SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-05HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-03SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-04-29HousePassed H., Ayes 78, Nays 10, PNV 0
2021-04-29HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0390)
2021-04-29HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-04-29SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-04-29SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-04-29SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0369)
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-04-14SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
2021-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1319 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 358

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback