TN SB0946 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the 4 percent state sales tax on food for human consumption; increases the tax on cigarettes from three cents per cigarette to 8.35 cents per cigarette; increases the tax on other tobacco products from 6.6 percent to 17 percent of the wholesale cost price. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, eliminates the 4 percent state sales tax on food for human consumption; increases the tax on cigarettes from three cents per cigarette to 8.35 cents per cigarette; increases the tax on other tobacco products from 6.6 percent to 17 percent of the wholesale cost price. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1213 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee