TN SB0937 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of E&E Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of E&E Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes prohibition against using bait, including grain and other ingredients, used as or for food purposes, to capture or kill protected birds or animals. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, deletes prohibition against using bait, including grain and other ingredients, used as or for food purposes, to capture or kill protected birds or animals. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Faulk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-08 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of E&E Com. | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. E,C&T Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0800 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-22 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Conservation
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0937&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0937.pdf |