TN SB0921 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the board of optometry to notify the chair of the health committee of the house of representatives and the chair of the senate health and welfare committee within 30 days if a member of the board is removed from office. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the board of optometry to notify the chair of the health committee of the house of representatives and the chair of the senate health and welfare committee within 30 days if a member of the board is removed from office. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 8.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-02-27SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/27/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0293 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback