TN SB0921 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 339
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Hearing Protection Act," which deletes the prohibition on possession, manufacture, transport, repair, or sale of a firearm silencer. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1301 and Section 39-17-1302.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Hearing Protection Act," which deletes the prohibition on possession, manufacture, transport, repair, or sale of a firearm silencer. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1301 and Section 39-17-1302.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19 Pub. Ch. 339
2017-05-19 Effective date(s) 07/01/2017
2017-05-09SenateSigned by Governor.
2017-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2017-05-03HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-05-02SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-05-02SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2017-05-01HousePassed H., Ayes 74, Nays 18, PNV 0
2017-05-01HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 1 - HA0553)
2017-05-01HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2017-04-06HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2017-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-04-03SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 1
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/3/2017
2017-03-30SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/3/17
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2017
2017-03-21SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0011 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 339

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback