TN SB0919 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands definition of "wild ginseng" to include ginseng introduced or increased in abundance in its natural habitat by introducing plantlets sourced from wild ginseng stock; defines plantlets. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 8, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, expands definition of "wild ginseng" to include ginseng introduced or increased in abundance in its natural habitat by introducing plantlets sourced from wild ginseng stock; defines plantlets. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 8, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 125 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2019 | |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0103 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 125