TN SB0902 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, makes the offense of obstructing public highways and streets where the obstruction restricts emergency vehicle access a Class B misdemeanor punishable by a fine of $200. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 54 and Title 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, makes the offense of obstructing public highways and streets where the obstruction restricts emergency vehicle access a Class B misdemeanor punishable by a fine of $200. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 54 and Title 55.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19 Pub. Ch. 121
2017-04-19 Effective date(s) 07/01/2017
2017-04-12SenateSigned by Governor.
2017-04-03SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2017-04-03HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-04-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-03-31SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2017-03-30HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 0
2017-03-30HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0149)
2017-03-30HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2017-03-27HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2017-03-23SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-03-23SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-23SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 2, PNV 1
2017-03-23SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0138)
2017-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2017
2017-03-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2017
2017-03-13SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2017-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/13/2017
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1051 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 121

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback