TN SB0873 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 146
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 146
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes state employees to serve as election officials at the polling place. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, authorizes state employees to serve as election officials at the polling place. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Pub. Ch. 146 |
2013-04-24 | House | Effective date(s) 04/12/2013 |
2013-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-02 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-03-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-03-26 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-03-21 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2013-03-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 27, Nays 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/7/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0578 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 146