TN SB0844 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1068
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes a terminal building of a commercial air carrier airport that is a member of the Tennessee Association of Air Carrier Airports to obtain a retail license to sell certain alcoholic beverages; revises certain provisions governing delivery; authorizes the City of Elkton in Giles County to hold a referendum on the sale of wine in retail food stores; revises other provisions governing alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes a terminal building of a commercial air carrier airport that is a member of the Tennessee Association of Air Carrier Airports to obtain a retail license to sell certain alcoholic beverages; revises certain provisions governing delivery; authorizes the City of Elkton in Giles County to hold a referendum on the sale of wine in retail food stores; revises other provisions governing alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1068
2016-04-19SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2016-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016
2016-04-12SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 1
2016-04-06SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2016
2016-03-30SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
2016-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2016
2016-03-29SenateAction deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to 3/30/2016
2016-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/29/2016
2016-03-22SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/29/2016
2016-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
2015-02-18SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2015-02-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0301 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1068

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback