TN SB0838 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state group insurance plan, starting in the 2022 plan year, to have an alternate allowable charges schedule to allow enrollees to utilize the services of any licensed medical provider in the United States without being penalized with out-of-network cost sharing charges, except as provided in the schedule, and to have a preferred tier and non-preferred tier. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 56.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8 and Title 56, relative to state health plan rates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0939 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Def. to Summer Study in Public Service Subcommittee