TN SB0828 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the commissioner to report, by January 1, 2018, and each January 1 thereafter, certain information regarding franchise and excise tax credits claimed for tax periods ending during the previous fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires the commissioner to report, by January 1, 2018, and each January 1 thereafter, certain information regarding franchise and excise tax credits claimed for tax periods ending during the previous fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 251
2017-04-19SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2017-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2017
2017-04-04SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
2017-03-15SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation, as amended
2017-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/15/2017
2017-03-01SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/15/2017
2017-02-22SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/1/2017
2017-02-21SenateRefer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0844 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 251

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback