TN SB0819 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the enforcement of the Water Quality Control Act; clarifies that the department of environment and conservation is the sole state agency authorized to conduct investigations under the Act and that other state agencies may assist the department in satisfying its duties under the Act. - Amends TCA Title 69 and Title 70.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the enforcement of the Water Quality Control Act; clarifies that the department of environment and conservation is the sole state agency authorized to conduct investigations under the Act and that other state agencies may assist the department in satisfying its duties under the Act. - Amends TCA Title 69 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Pub. Ch. 148 | |
2017-04-19 | Effective date(s) 04/17/2017 | |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0126) |
2017-04-06 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-23 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0107) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0764 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 148