TN SB0813 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a Class A misdemeanor of leaving a firearm or firearm ammunition unattended or with a person under 18 years of age in a motor vehicle or boat, if the firearm is not locked within a trunk, glove box, or interior of the person's motor vehicle or boat; punishable only by fine of at least $500. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, creates a Class A misdemeanor of leaving a firearm or firearm ammunition unattended or with a person under 18 years of age in a motor vehicle or boat, if the firearm is not locked within a trunk, glove box, or interior of the person's motor vehicle or boat; punishable only by fine of at least $500. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0801 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee