TN SB0813 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a Class A misdemeanor of leaving a firearm or firearm ammunition unattended or with a person under 18 years of age in a motor vehicle or boat, if the firearm is not locked within a trunk, glove box, or interior of the person's motor vehicle or boat; punishable only by fine of at least $500. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a Class A misdemeanor of leaving a firearm or firearm ammunition unattended or with a person under 18 years of age in a motor vehicle or boat, if the firearm is not locked within a trunk, glove box, or interior of the person's motor vehicle or boat; punishable only by fine of at least $500. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0801 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback