TN SB0806 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 505
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 505
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, splits the electronic monitoring indigency fund into two accounts to be used to pay for ignition interlock devices for indigent defendants and to pay, subject to local matching funds, for transdermal monitoring devices, other alcohol and drug monitoring devices, and global positioning monitoring devices for indigent defendants. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 55 and Title 69, Chapter 9.
Title
As enacted, splits the electronic monitoring indigency fund into two accounts to be used to pay for ignition interlock devices for indigent defendants and to pay, subject to local matching funds, for transdermal monitoring devices, other alcohol and drug monitoring devices, and global positioning monitoring devices for indigent defendants. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 55 and Title 69, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 505 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0950 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 505