TN SB0798 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the penalty to a Class B felony for 15 grams or more or a Class A felony for 150 grams or more of fentanyl, carfentanil, remifentanil, alfentanil, thiafentanil, or any fentanyl derivative or analogue. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, increases the penalty to a Class B felony for 15 grams or more or a Class A felony for 150 grams or more of fentanyl, carfentanil, remifentanil, alfentanil, thiafentanil, or any fentanyl derivative or analogue. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 201 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 04/25/2019 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0235) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0235) |
2019-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-01 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0942 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 201